+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On October 15, 1990 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 101-430.
On October 4, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 3, 1990 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 3, 1990 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 2, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 1, 1990 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On July 30, 1990 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 397.
- Mr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Mr. Lagomarsino demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - Subsequently, pursuant to a unanimous consent agreement by Mr. Montgomery, the ordering of the yeas and nays was vacated and the question will be put to a voice vote.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Reported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-638.
On July 25, 1990 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On July 19, 1990 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 21, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 21, 1990 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On May 3, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On April 2, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Received in the House.
On April 2, 1990 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 28, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
On March 22, 1990 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 488.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 101-256.
On March 8, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On September 12, 1989 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
On August 7, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior and Office of Management and Budget.
On July 27, 1989 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On July 26, 1989 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 22, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor