+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 21, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Resources
On October 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.3824 Proposed by Senator Craig for Senator Baucus. To authorize appropriations for the National Environmental Waste Technology Testing and Evaluation Center.
- S.AMDT.3824 Amendment SP 3824 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 14, 1998 in the House:
- Received in the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Held at the desk.
On July 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 507.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-273 .
On July 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-819.
On September 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3824
To authorize appropriations for the National Environmental Waste Technology Testing and Evaluation Center.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor