+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 9, 1992 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On September 30, 1992 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Cleared for White House.
On September 23, 1992 in the House:
- Senate agreed to the House amendment. By Voice Vote.
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On August 11, 1992 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On August 10, 1992 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Brooks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 471.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 102-826.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 22, 1992 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
On June 24, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees.
On June 1, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
On May 27, 1992 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
On May 26, 1992 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On May 26, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
On May 21, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 457.
On May 7, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
- Subcommittee on Immigration and Refugee Affairs. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 3, 1992 in the Senate:
On June 4, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor