+ − Summary
+ − Actions (5)
On June 28, 1990 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On October 24, 1989 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-694.
On July 11, 1989 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks.
On June 20, 1989 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Hearings held.
On June 16, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor