+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 6, 1997 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-54.
- Signed by President.
On October 2, 1997 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 1, 1997 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to House amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered as unfinished business.
On September 29, 1997 in the House:
- Mr. Smith moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Traficant objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
On September 24, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
On September 22, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On September 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.1247 Amendment SP 1247 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.1247 Proposed by Senator Jeffords for Senator Hatch. To provide for waiver of fees for nonimmigrants engaged in certain charitable activities.
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1247
To provide for waiver of fees for nonimmigrants engaged in certain charitable activities.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor