+ − Summary
+ − Actions (27)
On May 3, 1984 in the Senate:
- Became Private Law No: 98-11.
- Signed by President.
On April 26, 1984 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On April 12, 1984 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On April 12, 1984 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments to House Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On April 11, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred with amendment SP2954 to the House amendment by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.2954 Amendment SP 2954 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2954 Proposed by Senator Baker for Senator Packwood. To correct a spelling error.
On February 7, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
On November 9, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 9, 1983 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 98-517.
On November 9, 1983 in the Senate:
- Ordered to be Reported .
On November 9, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on Private Calendar No: 34.
On November 2, 1983 in the Senate:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 19, 1983 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Merchant Marine.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT.
On August 4, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
On August 4, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 3, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 340.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Packwood without amendment. Without written report.
On August 2, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 2, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2954
To correct a spelling error.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor