+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 16, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-121.
- Signed by President.
On November 9, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On November 9, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On November 8, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to Senate amendment.
On October 31, 1979 in the House:
- Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment.
On June 4, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 4016 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On May 23, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 16, 1979 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, S. Rept. 96-186.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor