+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-132.
- Signed by President.
On November 29, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On November 28, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On November 27, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On November 27, 1979 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On November 27, 1979 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report.
On November 16, 1979 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 96-418.
On November 16, 1979 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-628.
On October 23, 1979 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On October 19, 1979 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On October 16, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 3303 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On June 4, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #115 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On May 15, 1979 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 96-173.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor