+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-154.
- Signed by President.
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1147 .
- Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 387 - 25 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 216.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor