+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 24, 2018 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- Received in the House.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5869)
- S.Amdt.4002 Amendment SA 4002 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4002 Amendment SA 4002 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S5836) In the nature of a substitute.
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5868-5869)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On July 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-311.
On July 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 536.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 4002
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.4002
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor