+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 11, 1984 in the House:
- Unanimous Consent Request to Agree with an Amendment to the Senate Amendment to the House Amendment Rejected in House.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On October 10, 1984 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House amendment with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate.
- S.AMDT.7099 Amendment SP 7099 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.7099 Proposed by Senator Baker for Senator McClure. To strike extraneous matters from the House amendment.
On October 1, 1984 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 24, 1984 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 594.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 98-1052.
On September 18, 1984 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 1, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On June 7, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 4, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power.
On April 2, 1984 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
On March 30, 1984 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On March 12, 1984 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 703.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator McClure with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 98-363.
On February 28, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 1, 1984 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On August 24, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from OMB. Unfavorable.
On July 25, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-262.
On June 13, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, Agriculture Department, Army Corps of Engineers, Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, OMB.
On April 21, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.7099
To strike extraneous matters from the House amendment.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor