+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 14, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-282.
- Signed by President.
On May 7, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On May 6, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to Senate amendments under Suspension of the Rules, roll call #206 .
On March 21, 1974 in the House:
- Senate agreed to House amendments with an amendment.
On January 21, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 11387 .
On June 22, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
On June 21, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On June 13, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Labor and Public Welfare with amendment, S. Rept. 93-208.
On March 8, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Labor and Public Welfare.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor