+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 22, 2002 in the House:
- Senate disagreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 20, 2002 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
On September 25, 2002 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 24, 2002 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1105 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 388.
On September 4, 2002 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-639 .
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands Discharged.
On July 24, 2002 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
On November 5, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
On October 23, 2001 in the House:
- Received in the House.
On October 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.1904 Amendment SA 1904 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.1904 Amendment SA 1904 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Thomas. In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 175.
On October 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 107-73 .
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On August 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 107-204.
On July 26, 2001 in the Senate:
On June 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1904
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor