+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 27, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-387.
- Signed by President.
On September 15, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 14, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 13, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On September 12, 1978 in the House:
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure passed House, amended.
On July 18, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1366.
On June 1, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
On May 26, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On May 25, 1977 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar in Senate under Measures Cleared to be Considered by Unanimous Consent.
On May 23, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-228.
On March 23, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor