+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 567.
- Senate passed companion measure H.R. 820 in lieu of this measure by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate incorporated this measure in H.R. 820 as an amendment.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4022 Amendment SA 4022 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4022 Amendment SA 4022 proposed by Senator Campbell for Senator Snowe. To make changes and additions to the bill as reported by the Committee.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On June 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on the bill.
On May 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 567.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-300 .
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.2882 Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. To authorize $138,000,000 for the construction or acquisition of a replacement vessel for the Coast Guard icebreaker MACKINAW.
On May 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.2882
To authorize $138,000,000 for the construction or acquisition of a replacement vessel for the Coast Guard icebreaker MACKINAW.
S.AMDT.4022
To make changes and additions to the bill as reported by the Committee.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor