+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On February 5, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-248.
- Signed by President.
On January 24, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On January 22, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House, in lieu of H.R. 5975 .
- Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries discharged in House.
On November 6, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
On November 5, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On November 2, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, S. Rept. 93-482.
On March 1, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor