+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On December 5, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-512.
- Signed by President.
On November 25, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On November 21, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On November 18, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #628 .
On October 9, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1453.
On October 9, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
On October 4, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On October 3, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 93-419.
On March 1, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor