+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 28, 1977 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-218.
- Signed by President.
On December 19, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 16, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 16, 1977 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 15, 1977 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On November 2, 1977 in the House:
- Committee on the District of Columbia discharged in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 9544 .
On June 1, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
On May 26, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On May 25, 1977 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar in Senate under Measures Cleared to be Considered by Unanimous Consent.
On May 23, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate, from the Committee on Governmental Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-227.
On March 21, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor