+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 18, 1977 in the Senate:
- Private Law 95-8.
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 5, 1977 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 4, 1977 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Senate agreed to House amendment.
On September 26, 1977 in the House:
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #584 .
On September 20, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia with amendment, H. Rept. 95-612.
On June 1, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
On May 26, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On May 25, 1977 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar in Senate under Measures Cleared to be Considered by Unanimous Consent.
On May 23, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 95-226.
On March 21, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor