+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 18, 1977 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-192.
- Signed by President.
On November 8, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On November 4, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On November 4, 1977 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On November 3, 1977 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
On November 2, 1977 in the House:
- Senate agreed to House amendments with an amendment.
On June 6, 1977 in the House:
- Committee on Agriculture discharged in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H.R. 75 .
On March 24, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
On March 23, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unaminous consent in Senate.
On March 22, 1977 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate under Measures Cleared to be Considered by Unaminous Consent.
On March 18, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition and Forestry with amendment, S. Rept. 95-59.
On January 10, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture and Forestry .
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor