+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On December 1, 1983 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-193.
- Signed by President.
On November 23, 1983 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 22, 1983 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On November 18, 1983 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On September 27, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 5, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Packwood under the authority of the order of Jun 29, 83 without amendment. With written report No. 98-172.
On June 10, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 13, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor