+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On November 26, 1997 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Signed by President.
On November 19, 1997 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 9, 1997 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
On November 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- Mr. Castle moved to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report, H. Rept. 105-392 .
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Senate agreed to conference report by Unanimous Consent.
On November 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Conference report H. Rept. 105-392 filed.
On November 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Conferees agreed to file conference report.
- Conference papers: Senate report and managers' statement and official papers held at the desk in Senate.
On November 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to request for conference. Appointed conferees. D'Amato; Grams; Hagel; Sarbanes; Moseley-Braun.
On October 31, 1997 in the House:
- Senate disagreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill and House requests a conference.
On October 7, 1997 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 6, 1997 in the House:
- Held at the desk.
- The House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 1370 . Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Castle asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- On motion that the House insist upon its amendment, and request a conference Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- A similar measure H.R. 1370 was laid on the table without objection.
- Mr. Castle asked unanimous consent that the House insist upon its amendment, and request a conference.
- The Speaker appointed conferees: Leach, Castle, Bereuter, LaFalce, and Flake.
On September 17, 1997 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On September 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
On September 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator D'Amato with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-76 .
- Committee on Banking. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on International Finance . Hearings held.
On July 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor