+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 22, 1974 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
On May 20, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On May 2, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations, S. Rept. 93-802.
On April 23, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Foreign Relations.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce with amendment, S. Rept. 93-787.
On February 26, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor