+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 4, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.2122 Amendment SP 2122 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2122 Proposed by Senator Baker for Senator Hatch. To make technical modifications.
On June 28, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources filed written report. Report No. 98-166.
On May 16, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 150.
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On May 5, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 4, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On April 14, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Labor and Human Resources requested executive comment from Education Department, OMB.
- Subcommittee on Education. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Education.
On April 7, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2122
To make technical modifications.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor