+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 30, 1978 in the House:
- Private Law 95-141.
- Signed by President.
On October 23, 1978 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 14, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
On September 28, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 95-1647.
On June 28, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
On June 27, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On June 22, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 95-943.
On March 15, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor