+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 21, 1984 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On November 15, 1983 in the Senate:
- Senate passed companion measure H.R. 2293 in lieu of this measure by Voice Vote.
- Senate incorporated this measure in H.R. 2293 as an amendment.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.2611 Amendment SP 2611 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2610 Amendment SP 2610 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2611 Proposed by Senator Byrd. To require the Office of Federal Procurement Policy to review certain procurement practices and procedures of the Department of Defense and to report its findings, conclusions, and recommendations to the Congress.
- S.AMDT.2610 Proposed by Senator Cohen. To make certain technical amendments.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs filed written report under the authority of the order of Aug 4, 83. Report No. 98-214.
On September 1, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 331.
On August 1, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Cohen with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
- Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-139.
On April 27, 1983 in the Senate:
On April 7, 1983 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.2610
To make certain technical amendments.
S.AMDT.2611
To require the Office of Federal Procurement Policy to review certain procurement practices and procedures of the Department of Defense and to report its findings, conclusions, and recommendations to the Congress.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor