+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 22, 1997 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-63.
- Signed by President.
On October 10, 1997 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 23, 1997 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Speaker put the question on the motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill and announced that, by voice vote, the Motion was agreed to. Mr. Condit objected to the vote on grounds that a quorum was not present and made a point of order that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings were postponed and the point of no quourum was withdrawn.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Mr. Kim moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On August 11, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development.
On July 28, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On July 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor