+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 5, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 3, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 13, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 7, 1993 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On June 15, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee On Insular and International Affairs.
On May 18, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations and Human Rights.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
On May 5, 1993 in the House:
- Referred jointly to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred jointly to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor