+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On July 17, 2017 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 380). (text: CR H5892)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5901-5902)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 92.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5892-5894)
- Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 64.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-228.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Discharged.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor