+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
On November 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On November 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On November 13, 2001 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 88 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On April 16, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Civil Service and Agency Organization.
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor