+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 115-54. (TXT | PDF)
On August 11, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 8/3/2017 S4806)
On August 4, 2017 in the House:
- ENGROSSMENT CORRECTION - Unanimous consent was granted for the Clerk to make changes in the engrossment of H.J.Res. 76 that was placed at the desk. Agreed to without objection.
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Senate returned papers to House, per House request of July 24, 2017, by Unanimous Consent.
On July 24, 2017 in the House:
- House requested return of papers pursuant to H.Res. 469.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
On July 17, 2017 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5902-5903)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 5 (Roll no. 381). (text: CR H5894-5897)
- Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 76.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5894-5900)
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 162.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-227.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Discharged.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor