+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 1, 2022 in the House:
- Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1499, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4601, as amended; H.R. 4772, as amended; H.R. 4899; H.R. 5943, as amended; H.R. 7158, as amended; H.R. 8203; H.R. 9308; and S. 3825; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 744, as amended; and H. Res. 922, as amended. S. 3825; (consideration: CR H8696-8700; text: CR H8698-8699)
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1499, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4601, as amended; H.R. 4772, as amended; H.R. 4899; H.R. 5943, as amended; H.R. 7158, as amended; H.R. 8203; H.R. 9308; and S. 3825; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 744, as amended; and H. Res. 922, as amended. S. 3825;
- Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1499, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4601, as amended; H.R. 4772, as amended; H.R. 4899; H.R. 5943, as amended; H.R. 7158, as amended; H.R. 8203; H.R. 9308; and S. 3825; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 744, as amended; and H. Res. 922, as amended. (consideration: CR H8696-8700; text: CR H8698-8699)
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1499, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4601, as amended; H.R. 4772, as amended; H.R. 4899; H.R. 5943, as amended; H.R. 7158, as amended; H.R. 8203; H.R. 9308; and S. 3825; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 744, as amended; and H. Res. 922, as amended.
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1499, proceedings on H. Res. 744 are considered vacated.
On November 29, 2022 in the House:
- ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Ms. Schakowsky asked unanimous consent that she may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H. Res. 744, a bill originally introduced by Representative Deutch, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 744.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8631-8633; text: CR H8631-8632)
- Ms. Jacobs (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On July 28, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
On July 27, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and Global Counterterrorism Discharged.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and Global Counterterrorism.
On October 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (77)
Type:
Primary Sponsor