+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6765)
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 8, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5806)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5806)
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
- Mr. Crawford asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On July 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor