+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 14, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-463.
- Signed by President.
- Measure presented to President.
On October 12, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 12, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 10, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 10, 1978 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
On October 4, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On September 29, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On July 19, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1376.
On January 23, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor