+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (57)
On September 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- S.AMDT.608 SA 608 fell when SA 607 withdrawn.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.602 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.603 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.604 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.605 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.606 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.607 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.608 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.609 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.607 Proposed amendment SA 607 withdrawn in Senate.
- Motion by Senator Reid to commit to Senate Committee on Finance with instructions to report back forthwith with amendment SA 607 withdrawn in Senate.
- S.AMDT.609 SA 609 fell when SA 608 fell.
- S.AMDT.610 Amendment SA 610 under the order of 9/15/2011, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45.
- Cloture motion on the joint resolution rendered moot in Senate.
- S.AMDT.602 Cloture motion on amendment SA 602 rendered moot in Senate.
- S.AMDT.602 Amendment SA 602 under the order of 9/15/2011, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 62 - 37.
- S.AMDT.606 Proposed amendment SA 606 withdrawn in Senate.
- S.AMDT.613 Amendment SA 613 under the order of 9/15/2011, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 20 - 78.
- S.AMDT.613 Amendment SA 613 proposed by Senator Paul to Amendment SA 602. To offset the disaster relief appropriations by rescinding amounts for foreign assistance programs.
- S.AMDT.610 Amendment SA 610 proposed by Senator Coburn to Amendment SA 602. To save at least $7,000,000,000 by consolidating some duplicative and overlapping Government programs.
- S.AMDT.603 Proposed amendment SA 603 withdrawn in Senate.
- S.AMDT.604 Proposed amendment SA 604 withdrawn in Senate.
- S.AMDT.605 Proposed amendment SA 605 withdrawn in Senate.
On September 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate.
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate.
- S.AMDT.604 Amendment SA 604 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 603. Of a perfecting nature.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.602 Amendment SA 602 proposed by Senator Reid. In the nature of a substitute.
- S.AMDT.603 Amendment SA 603 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 602. To change the enactment date.
- S.AMDT.607 Amendment SA 607 proposed by Senator Reid. To change the enactment date.
- S.AMDT.605 Amendment SA 605 proposed by Senator Reid to language proposed to be stricken by amendment no. 602. Of a perfecting nature.
- S.AMDT.606 Amendment SA 606 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 605. Of a perfecting nature.
- S.AMDT.602 Cloture motion on amendment SA 602 presented in Senate.
- Cloture motion on the joint resolution presented in Senate.
- Motion by Senator Reid to commit to Senate Committee on Finance with instructions to report back forthwith with amendment SA 607 made in Senate.
- S.AMDT.608 Amendment SA 608 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 607. Of a perfecting nature.
- S.AMDT.609 Amendment SA 609 proposed by Senator Reid to Amendment SA 608. Of a perfecting nature.
On September 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Upon reconsideration, cloture on the motion to proceed to the joint resolution invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 38.
- Motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the joint resolution agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate.
On September 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate.
- Cloture on the motion to proceed to the joint resolution not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 33.
- Motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the joint resolution entered in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On September 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the joint resolution presented in Senate.
- Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
On September 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 154.
On September 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On July 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 20, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 66 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Boustany moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendments (10)
S.AMDT.602
In the nature of a substitute.
S.AMDT.603
To change the enactment date.
S.AMDT.604
Of a perfecting nature.
S.AMDT.605
Of a perfecting nature.
S.AMDT.606
Of a perfecting nature.
S.AMDT.607
To change the enactment date.
S.AMDT.608
Of a perfecting nature.
S.AMDT.609
Of a perfecting nature.
S.AMDT.610
To save at least $7,000,000,000 by consolidating some duplicative and overlapping Government programs.
S.AMDT.613
To offset the disaster relief appropriations by rescinding amounts for foreign assistance programs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor