+ − Actions (11)
On March 2, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy.
On February 19, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law.
On February 18, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB.
On February 11, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On February 9, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fossil and Synthetic Fuels.
On February 6, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor