+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 9, 1977 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-165.
- Signed by President.
On November 8, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On November 8, 1977 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On November 4, 1977 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On November 4, 1977 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On November 3, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On November 2, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 95-792.
On November 1, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor