+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 236 - 185 .
- On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 241 - 179 .
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 631 .
- Considered as privileged matter.
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 127.
- The rule waives all points of order against consideration of the bill. The rule makes in order as original text for purpose of amendment the amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 112-20 and provides that it shall be considered as read. The rule waives all points of order against the amendment in the nature of a substitute. The rule makes in order only those amendments printed in the Rules Committee report. The rule further provides that it shall be in order at any time through the legislative day of April 27, 2012, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules. The rule provides further for a closed rule for consideration of H.R. 4628 . The rule provides one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. Finally, the rule provides that the Committee on Appropriations may, at any time before 6 p.m. on Wednesday, May 2, 2012 recommit. Finally, the rule provides that the Committee on Appropriations may, at any time before 6 p.m. on Wednesday, May 2, 2012 file, privileged reports to accompany measures making appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2013.
- The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 112-454 , by Mr. Nugent.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor