+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On May 8, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-292.
- Signed by President.
On May 7, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On May 6, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On May 2, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 2, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On May 1, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On April 30, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.803 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Voice Vote.
- H.AMDT.803 Amendment Offered by Representative Garcia. An amendment to make a technical correction.
On March 18, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.803
An amendment to make a technical correction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor