+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 20, 2022 in the House:
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1361, proceedings on H. Res. 558 are considered vacated.
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 2 of H. Res. 1361, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1433, as amended; H.R. 4009, as amended; H.R. 4358, as amended; H.R. 6265; H.R. 6846, as amended; H.R. 7240, as amended; H.R. 7338, as amended; H.R. 8453, as amended; H.R. 8503, as amended; and H.R. 8520, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 558, as amended.
- Pursuant to section 2 of H. Res. 1361, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1433, as amended; H.R. 4009, as amended; H.R. 4358, as amended; H.R. 6265; H.R. 6846, as amended; H.R. 7240, as amended; H.R. 7338, as amended; H.R. 8453, as amended; H.R. 8503, as amended; and H.R. 8520, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 558, as amended. (consideration: CR H7984-7992; text: CR H7991-7992)
On September 19, 2022 in the House:
- Mr. Malinowski moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7908-7911)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 558.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On July 28, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 27, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation Discharged.
On August 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation.
On July 26, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor