+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On October 3, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-371.
- Signed by President.
On September 24, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On September 23, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 23, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 19, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 19, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On September 18, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary .
On August 1, 1980 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On July 30, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service and Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries discharged in House.
On May 14, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor