+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-267.
- Signed by President.
On April 3, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On April 2, 1990 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On April 2, 1990 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 29, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 29, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On March 28, 1990 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
On March 13, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On March 5, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor