+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On May 28, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-326.
- Signed by President.
On May 19, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On May 15, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 15, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On May 8, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On May 7, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On December 27, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On December 17, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor