+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On October 13, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From DOD.
On September 13, 1988 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From State.
On August 3, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science Discharged.
- Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East Discharged.
On July 21, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From ACDA.
On July 5, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, DOD, Arms Control & Disarm Agcy.
On June 27, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
On June 15, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor