+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On March 7, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs, S. Rept. 95-673.
On February 28, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On February 27, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #88 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On February 21, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 95-891.
On February 6, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor