+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 22, 1986 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Yea-Nay Vote: 406 - 0 .
- Called up by House as Privileged Matter.
On July 16, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 171.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 99-688.
On June 26, 1986 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 24, 1986 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 19, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 5, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
On June 3, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor