+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-166.
- Signed by President.
On April 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On March 31, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 31, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 30, 1982 in the House:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 387 - 3 .
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 29, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor