+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 14, 1985 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 99-154.
- Signed by President.
On November 13, 1985 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Cleared for White House.
On November 13, 1985 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
On November 12, 1985 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 259 - 151 .
- Called up by House by Rule.
- Rule Passed House.
- H.AMDT.615 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Voice Vote.
- H.AMDT.615 Amendment Offered by Representative Whitten. An amendment to change the expiration dates for the resolution from December 5, 1985 to December 12, 1985.
On November 7, 1985 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H.Res.312 Reported to House.
- Committee on Rules Granted a Modified Closed Rule Providing One Hour of Debate.
On November 5, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.615
An amendment to change the expiration dates for the resolution from December 5, 1985 to December 12, 1985.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor