+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 18, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On September 17, 1990 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Broomfield demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- Mr. Yatron moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
On September 13, 1990 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 12, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On July 25, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On May 14, 1990 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received from State.
On April 2, 1990 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On November 13, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
On November 2, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor