+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8365-8366)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 422.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8365-8368)
- Mr. Yoho moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
On September 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House